THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:06:06 AM
Sharma, Om Prakash
CPSO#:
85818
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nagpur University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1027 Washington AVE
Detroit Lakes MN 56501
United States
Phone: 2188442300
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Om Prakash Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Illinois
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OM PRAKASH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 09 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |