THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:39:32 AM
Herath, Chaturika Harshini Pavithra
CPSO#:
85809
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: University of Peradeniya, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2158
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHATURIKA HARSHINI PAVITHRA HERATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERATH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
EL - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2019 |