THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:28:45 PM
Melamed, Penina
CPSO#:
85808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane St
Unit 5
Toronto ON M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: (416) 249-4594
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PENINA MELAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELAMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2009 |