THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:09:59 AM
Lopez, Christopher John
CPSO#:
85804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 997-3700
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Dec 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 10 Aug 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |