THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:57:25 PM
Yu-Siao, Barbara Ann
CPSO#:
85801
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
69 Facer Street
St Catharines ON L2M 5J3
Phone: (905) 935-2828
Fax: (905) 935-5478
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B. Yu-Siao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN YU-SIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU-SIAO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2009 |