THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:16:41 AM
Hakim, Mukhtar M M
CPSO#:
85800
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0052
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUKHTAR M M HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 26 Feb 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 27 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2008 to 23 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2011 to 23 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 29 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |