THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:15:55 AM
Khan, Sabina Imran
CPSO#:
85785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: Quaid-i-Azam University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cypress Regional Hospital
2004 Saskatchewan Drive
Swift Current SK S9H 5M8
Phone: (306) 778-9400
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S.I. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SABINA IMRAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Apr 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |