THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:21:56 PM
Dohal, Ahlam Ahmed Mohamad
CPSO#:
85780
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Al-Jizani, Ahlam Ahmed Mohamad (used until: 13 Mar 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Faisal University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |