THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:31:06 PM
Sandhu, Sharron Kaur
CPSO#:
85770
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Rheumatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:13 Sep 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 19 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2021 |
|
Active |