THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:17:18 PM
Gomez Lemus, Jose Alejandro
CPSO#:
85769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
28 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32956
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:15 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSE ALEJANDRO GOMEZ LEMUS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2012 |