THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:22:05 PM
AlGhamdi, Samirah Ali Saeed
CPSO#:
85763
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 16 Nov 2006 to 29 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 30 Nov 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 05 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 06 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |