THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:32:20 AM
Scaranelo, Anabel Medeiros
CPSO#:
85761
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Estadual de Londrina, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
190 St. George St
Toronto ON M5R 2N4
Phone: 647 9629372
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:20 Dec 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2007 to 10 Nov 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Oct 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Oct 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Oct 2015 |
|
Active |