THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:50:52 AM
Kurz, Christine Jeanette
CPSO#:
85748
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:17 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |