THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:59:03 AM
Sallam, Sallam Abdel Muti Ahmed Mustafa
CPSO#:
85747
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Jordan, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2009 |