THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:11:20 AM
Saleem, Asifa Khatoon
CPSO#:
85720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9617
Fax: (905) 336-9638
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIFA KHATOON SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |