THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:28:45 AM
Papadopoulos, Yasmin Anna
CPSO#:
85710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universita Palackeho, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 302
Don Mills ON M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 445-9673
Fax: (416) 445-9388
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMIN ANNA PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Jan 2009 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2009 |