THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:17:03 AM
Naqi, Hadia
CPSO#:
85694
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Phone: 807-344-8475
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HADIA NAQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAQI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 30 Oct 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 21 Jan 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 30 Oct 2007 to 26 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |