THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:59:38 AM
Dahle, Colin Thomas
CPSO#:
85684
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin St E
Cobourg ON K9A 0A1
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2021 |