THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:22:52 PM
Sanchez, Angelita Rodriguez
CPSO#:
85670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of The East Philippines, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELITA RODRIGUEZ SANCHEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2009 |