THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:06:30 PM
Vause, Tannys Dawn Reiko
CPSO#:
85631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378 Ext. 623
Fax: (613) 225-9736
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TANNYS DAWN REIKO VAUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |