THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:13:47 PM
Bicamumpaka, Cyrille
CPSO#:
85583
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
06 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universite Nationale De Rwanda, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:07 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Sep 2011 |