THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:01:28 PM
Hasan, Fauzia
CPSO#:
85576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Anatomical Pathology
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000 Ext. 6085
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:10 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAUZIA HASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2006 to 21 Dec 2006
AVP - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2008 to 06 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2009 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2013 |