THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:00:12 AM
Sheikh, Adnan Mohammad
CPSO#:
85550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Bangalore University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 7 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2019 |
|
Active |