THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:07:54 PM
Ouellette, Michael Kevin
CPSO#:
85531
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pikangikum Nursing Station
General Delivery
Pikangikum ON P0V 2L0
Phone: (807) 773-5550
Fax: (807) 773-5298
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Mar 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KEVIN OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2009 |