THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:37:11 AM
Villa Restrepo, Diego
CPSO#:
85519
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jan 2011 |