THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:42:21 AM
Yaghoobi, Mohammad
CPSO#:
85515
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Yaghoobi Juibari, Mohammad (used until: 07 Nov 2007 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West-2F
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-4958
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD YAGHOOBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAGHOOBI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 02 Dec 2007
PEAP - R - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2014 |