THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:54:45 PM
Rajamanickam, Sendhan Amudhan
CPSO#:
85507
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 02 Nov 2006
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2006 to 16 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2007 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2008 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2017 |