THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:13:13 PM
Connelly, Kim Alexander
CPSO#:
85503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5263
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2016 |
|
Active |