THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:42:55 AM
Raheel, Erum
CPSO#:
85484
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 4T6
Phone: 416-439-0163
Fax: 416-439-7609
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERUM RAHEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHEEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2007 |