THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:01:15 AM
Okusanya, Olanrewaju Olatunji
CPSO#:
85441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
272 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1S9
Phone: 5194727373
Fax: 5192866531
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLANREWAJU OLATUNJI OKUSANYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUSANYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2007 to 20 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2008 to 20 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2009 to 20 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2013 |