THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:43:45 AM
Hildebrand, Kyla Jade
CPSO#:
85424
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kyla J. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:02 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
EL - Paediatric Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2008 to 06 Apr 2008
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |