THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:03:06 AM
Amirjani, Nasim
CPSO#:
85418
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
EL - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Sep 2007 to 12 Dec 2007
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 28 May 2008
EL - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2008 |