THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:03:33 PM
Al-Tatari, Hossam Mohamed
CPSO#:
85380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Medical University of Debrecen, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hossam Al-Tatari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2010
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Jul 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
|
Active |