THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:41:28 PM
Clarke, Blaise Alexander
CPSO#:
85366
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3396
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:15 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
|
Active |