THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:19:07 PM
Nel, Pierre Robert
CPSO#:
85354
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |