THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:22:07 AM
Eason, Bradley Dana
CPSO#:
85346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732 2811
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DANA EASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2009 |