THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:40:34 AM
Bennett, Barbara Fiebig
CPSO#:
85339
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: East Tennessee State University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hamilton Urban Core Community Health Centre, 71 Rebecca Street, Hamilton, ON L8R 1B6
Date Received: 10 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |