THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:32:32 AM
Roushdi, Amani Edward Anis
CPSO#:
85277
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2054
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANI EDWARD ANIS ROUSHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSHDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2010 |