THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:25:50 PM
Sherlock, Mary Evelyeen
CPSO#:
85270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
01 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Pediatric Gastroenterology
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76890
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:18 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY EVELYEEN SHERLOCK may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SHERLOCK holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SHERLOCK may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHERLOCK no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SHERLOCK no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SHERLOCK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |