THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:13:11 AM
Syed, Atyab Abbas Naqvi
CPSO#:
85241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207 - 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Phone: 905 794 4497
Fax: 905 794 7258
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATYAB ABBAS NAQVI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2018 |