THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 18:20:22 PM
Srinivasan, Ilavajady
CPSO#:
85238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ilavajady, Srinivasan (used until: 25 Oct 2007 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Thanjavur Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ILAVAJADY SRINIVASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVASAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Mar 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |