THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:28:22 AM
Tom-Pack, Maurice
CPSO#:
85235
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-3350 Thomas St
Mississauga ON L5M 0R2
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:31 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 14 Jan 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2023 |