THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:34:36 AM
Lukitto, Karolinah
CPSO#:
85233
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Indonesian
Education: UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: 9054727373
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAROLINAH LUKITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKITTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2014 |