THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:13:21 AM
Elahi, Sofia Iqbal Baig
CPSO#:
85212
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Kensington Road
Suite 507
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Phone: 905-792-2228
Fax: 905-792-2275
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sofia B. Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 10 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jan 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOFIA IQBAL BAIG ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2008 |