THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:31:43 AM
Dragan, Adriana
CPSO#:
85210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
unit 401
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-827-2524
Fax: 905-510-5667
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:18 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIANA DRAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2009 |