THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:35:42 AM
Miller, Elka
CPSO#:
85118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Spanish
Education: University of Costa Rica, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 University Ave
SickKids Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-5469
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Radiology |
Effective:30 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
|
Active |