THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:11:01 AM
Aleykina, Natalya Oleksandrivna
CPSO#:
85117
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Zaporozhye State Medical University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
242 King St
Trenton ON K8V 3X1
Phone: 6139225453
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Natalya Oleksandrivna Aleykina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALYA OLEKSANDRIVNA ALEYKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEYKINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2013 |