THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:24:34 PM
Go, Cristina Yip
CPSO#:
85108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4500 Oak St
BC Children's Hospital
Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:15 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
|
Active |