THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:26:13 AM
Ren, Haifeng
CPSO#:
85038
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Shanghai Medical University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
303-3410 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K4
Phone: 647.560.2366
Fax: 647.361.4637
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:27 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAIFENG REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |