THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:19:17 PM
Bishara, Mona Roshdy Youssif
CPSO#:
85033
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of General Pathology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2543
Fax: (519) 749-4221
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONA ROSHDY YOUSSIF BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |